KY HB7 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 77)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 77)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 222 to establish the Advisory Council for Recovery Ready Communities; establish membership and duties of the council; allow for the promulgation of administrative regulations.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Advisory Council for Recovery Ready Communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 215 (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1611 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 46 (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1611 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 46 (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 77) |
2021-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | passed 89-5 |
2021-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-04 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-03 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | received in House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 2, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-1 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2021-02-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9, 2021 |
2021-02-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-03 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-13 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2020-12-03 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Alcoholism
Cities
Counties
Diseases
Drugs and Medicines
Public Health
State Agencies
Alcoholism
Cities
Counties
Diseases
Drugs and Medicines
Public Health
State Agencies