KY HB71 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 532.031, relating to an offense committed as a result of a hate crime, to include criminal homicide and fetal homicide as well as the attempt to commit or solicitation of those crimes.
Title
AN ACT relating to hate crimes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Nemes [R] | Rep. Jerry Miller [R] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. Chad McCoy [R] |
Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. James Tipton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
2018-10-31 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Civil Rights
Corrections Impact
Crime Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Probation and Parole
Corrections Impact
Crime Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Probation and Parole