KY HB72 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 304.17A-164 to define "financial assistance" and "generic alternative;" and to require an insurer to apply financial assistance received by an insured toward any cost sharing owed by the insured with certain exceptions; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to prescription drugs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-03-09Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2020
2020-03-05House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-16Houseposted in committee
2020-01-07Houseto Banking & Insurance (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-10-24HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback