KY HB78 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 139.470 to exempt from sales and use tax pet adoption fees and certain small veterinarian service fees charged by local government animal shelters and nonprofit animal welfare organizations; apply to transactions on or after July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the exemption of certain animal services from sales and use tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-10Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-11-20HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback