KY HB79 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 29)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 29)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 309.350 to establish the definition for "massage establishment"; amend KRS 309.351 to allow licensed massage therapists to use pulsed electromagnetic field therapy or microcurrent devices for which they are trained; prohibit the application of ultrasounds and the prescribing of medication; amend KRS 309.354 to allow at least one board member to be a designated representative of a school owner or designated representative of a school director; amend KRS 309.355 to allow the board to fine any massage establishment that employs or contracts with unlicensed practitioners who perform massages; allow the board to fine any massage establishment that fails to report to the board any license massage therapist who violates KRS Chapter 309.350 to 309.364 or administrative regulations promulgated by the board while employed by the massage establishment; give the board the authority to hire staff for the work of the board; amend KRS 309.357 to remove the list of existing fees from statute and charge the board with promulgating administrative regulations that establish a reasonable schedule of fees for the issuance and restoration of licenses and certificates and for the renewal of licenses; establish the conditions under which a license may be reinstated or renewed; require the completion of one hour of continuing education for every six months a license has been in an inactive state; KRS 309.358 to add background checks conducted by the Kentucky State Police and the Federal Bureau of Investigation as a requirement for licensure; allow licensure to be obtained through an associate's degree if the program meets the requirements of a training program approved by the board; amend KRS 309.361 to require licensees to complete 12 hours of continuing education instead of 24 as a condition of licensure renewal; require 3 of the 12 hours of continuing education to be completed in ethics; amend KRS 309.362 to increase the cap on fines from $500 to $1,000 per violation for repeat offenders; amend KRS 309.363 to allow a school with the designation of "Approved Schhol" to meet the qualifications of having met the requirement that it be in good standing; amend KRS 309.3631 to require applications for the initial certificate of good standing and annual renewals to be submitted with a fee prescribed by the board.
Title
AN ACT relating to massage therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 229 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1612 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 63 (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1612 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 63 (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 29) |
2021-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | passed 94-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-04 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-03 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | received in House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 2, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-22 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | passed 81-4 with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-10 | House | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2021-02-10 | House | 3rd reading |
2021-02-09 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9, 2021 |
2021-02-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-13 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2020-10-28 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |