KY HB82 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS 158.440 to 158.449 to prohibit a person employed by a school district from using corporal physical discipline; amend KRS 158.444 to remove corporal punishment as a form of discipline in a school; amend KRS 199.640 as effective July 1, 2019, to establish that church-related privately operated child-caring agencies or facilities shall not use corporal physical discipline; amend KRS 503.110 to establish that physical force may not be used against a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to corporal physical discipline.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-10Houseto Education (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-11-27HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback