KY HB97 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - posted in committee
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - posted in committee
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 211.190 to allow local government entities and special districts to void implementation of the water fluoridation programs administered by the Cabinet for Health and Family Services by legislative action.
Title
AN ACT relating to water fluoridation programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-11 | House | reassigned to State Government (H) |
2019-01-10 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
2018-12-13 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hb97.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hb97/orig_bill.pdf |