KY HB99 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - posted in committee
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 141.019 to exclude from the computation of adjusted gross income certain contributions to a STABLE Kentucky account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to individual income tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-12-13HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback