KY HCR115 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - posted in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - posted in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Kentucky Highway Work Zone Safety Task Force to study ways to reduce highway work zone traffic incidents; outline task force membership; require the task force to meet monthly during the 2020 interim; allow the task force to submit findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2020.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION directing the Legislative Research Commission to establish the Kentucky Highway Work Zone Safety Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-02 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Legislative Research Commission
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Traffic Safety
Transportation
Legislative Research Commission
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Traffic Safety
Transportation
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hcr115.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hcr115/orig_bill.pdf |