KY HCR140 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the designation of a portion of the Wendell H. Ford Western Kentucky Parkway as Interstate 69 Spur.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the United States government to designate a portion of the Wendell H. Ford Western Kentucky Parkway as an Interstate spur for Interstate 69.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 248 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2019-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 6, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2019-03-04 | House | returned to Transportation (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | House | taken from Transportation (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-21 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | introduced in House |