KY HCR155 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - posted in committee
Pending: House Economic Development & Workforce Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - posted in committee
Pending: House Economic Development & Workforce Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the Education and Workforce Development Cabinet to establish reasonable, consistent standards for training providers in compliance with the Workforce Innovation and Opportunity Act before approval is given to a provider to be on the Kentucky Eligible Training Provider List and post graduation and job placement rates of training providers on its Web site by July 1, 2019, and annually thereafter, so the information is available to all participants and the general public.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Cabinet for Education and Workforce Development to establish reasonable, consistent standards for training providers who receive funds from the federal Workforce Investment and Opportunity Act funds for job training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hcr155.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hcr155/orig_bill.pdf |