KY HCR49 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Severe Mental Illness Task Force to study the provision of mental health services to adults with a severe mental illness; outline task force membership; require the task force to meet monthly during the 2020 Interim and to submit findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2020.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION establishing the Severe Mental Illness Task Force.
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] | Rep. Kimberly Banta [R] | Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 71 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-30 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-28 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-17 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | introduced in House |