KY HCR5 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 6)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 6)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urge federal policymakers to expedite research regarding the safety and efficacy of the use of marijuana for medical purposes.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION calling for the expediting of research regarding the safety and efficacy of the use of marijuana for medical purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. Adam Bowling [R] | Rep. Deanna Frazier Gordon [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1271 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 51 (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 51 (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 6) |
2020-03-04 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-04 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-03 | House | received in House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2020-02-03 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-2 |
2020-01-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 22, 2020 |
2020-01-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |