KY HCR56 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent resolution establishing a 17-member legislative task force to study small community public drinking water systems to create mechanisms for oversight and intervention so as to prevent the drinking system's decline and failure; policy options submitted to the Legislative Research Commission for referral by December 15, 2019.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION establishing the Public Water and Wastewater System Infrastructure Task Force.
Sponsors
Rep. James Tipton [R] | Rep. Chris Harris [D] | Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. Kathy Hinkle [D] |
Rep. Patti Minter [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 124 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-06 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Cities
Counties
Environment and Conservation
Legislative Research Commission
Local Government
Public Utilities
Public Works
Special Districts
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Water Supply
Counties
Environment and Conservation
Legislative Research Commission
Local Government
Public Utilities
Public Works
Special Districts
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Water Supply