KY HJR121 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Direct all hospitals offering emergency services, the Kentucky Board of Nursing, the Kentucky Association of Sexual Assault Programs, and the Kentucky Office of Victim Advocacy to report information relating to sexual assault nurse examinations and sexual assault medical-forensic examinations to the Interim Joint Committee on Health, Welfare, and Family Services by October 1, 2021; permit the co-chairs of the Interim Joint Committee on Health, Welfare, and Family Services to send the data to be analyzed and reported on by December 1, 2021.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION directing all hospitals offering emergency services, the Kentucky Board of Nursing, the Kentucky Association of Sexual Assault Programs, and the Kentucky Office of Victim Advocacy to report information relating to sexual assault nurse examiners and sexual assault medical-forensic examinations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Attorney General
Crime Victims
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Crime Victims
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hjr121.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hjr121/orig_bill.pdf |