KY HJR82 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-11)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Direct the commissioner of education to convene a strategic assessment and accountability committee; establish minimum requirements for the composition of the committee; establish the duties of the committee; require the commissioner to report the findings of the committee to the Interim Joint Committee on Education by December 1, 2020, and December 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A JOINT RESOLUTION relating to school accountability.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-03-09House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-06Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-03-02Houseposted in committee
2020-02-14Houseto Education (H)
2020-02-12Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback