KY HR120 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honor the Kentucky Colon Cancer Screening Program and recognize March 6, 2020, as Dress in Blue Day.
Title
A RESOLUTION honoring the Kentucky Colon Cancer Screening Program and recognizing March 6, 2020, as Dress in Blue Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2020-03-04 | House | to House Floor |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hr120.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hr120/orig_bill.pdf |