KY HR144 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - 3rd reading, passed 99-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - 3rd reading, passed 99-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the Public Service Commission to consider all costs related to the importation of coal for electricity generation.
Title
A RESOLUTION urging the Public Service Commission to consider all costs related to the importation of coal for electricity generation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 379 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-1 |
2019-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-22 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | introduced in House |