KY SB1 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 216B to require the secretary of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to designate as a primary stroke center any acute care hospital which has received a primary stroke center certification from the Joint Commission on Accreditation of Healthcare Organizations (JCAHO); suspend or revoke a designation if certification is withdrawn; promulgate administrative regulations to establish criteria for designation.
Title
AN ACT relating to primary stroke center certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 67) | |
2010-03-26 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-03-26 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-03-26 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-26 | passed 92-0 | |
2010-03-26 | 3rd reading | |
2010-03-09 | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed | |
2010-03-08 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-05 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 8, 2010 | |
2010-03-05 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-04 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-02 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-26 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2010-01-21 | received in House | |
2010-01-20 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-20 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 20, 2010 | |
2010-01-20 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-19 | returned to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2010-01-19 | 2nd reading | |
2010-01-19 | taken from committee | |
2010-01-11 | returned to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2010-01-11 | 1st reading | |
2010-01-11 | taken from committee | |
2010-01-11 | to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2010-01-08 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB1.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB1/bill.doc |