KY SB1 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Establish the Kentucky Council on Revenue Reform to assess the effectiveness of the state and local tax and revenue system and propose legislation to revise revenue statutes; declare legislative findings; provide for the appointment of members to the council; require the council to report to the Legislative Research Commission on or before November 30, 2011; provide sunset date for the council; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to fiscal policy, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-02-04 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-02 | received in House | |
2011-01-07 | passed 25-13 | |
2011-01-07 | floor amendments (1) and (2) defeated | |
2011-01-07 | 3rd reading | |
2011-01-07 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 7, 2011 | |
2011-01-06 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed | |
2011-01-06 | reported favorably, to Rules | |
2011-01-05 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-01-05 | 2nd reading | |
2011-01-05 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-01-04 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-01-04 | 1st reading | |
2011-01-04 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-01-04 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB1.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB1/bill.doc |