KY SB1 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-18 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-18 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend 2010 (1st Extra. Sess.) Kentucky Acts Chapter 1, the state/executive branch budget, to reallocate funds from fiscal year 2011-2012 to fiscal year 2010-2011 for postsecondary educational institutions; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT amending the 2010-2012 executive branch budget bill, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-03-17 | received in House | |
2011-03-16 | 3rd reading, passed 32-0 | |
2011-03-16 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2011 | |
2011-03-16 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2011-03-15 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-03-15 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-03-15 | 2nd reading | |
2011-03-15 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-03-14 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-03-14 | 1st reading | |
2011-03-14 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-03-14 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11SS/SB1.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11SS/SB1/bill.doc |