KY SB100 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 101)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 278.465 to increase the maximum capacity for an eligible electric generating facility to 45 kilowatts and to redefine "net metering"; amend KRS 278.466 to require the Public Service Commission to set the compensation rate for eligible customer-generators according to the ratemaking process in KRS Chapter 278; specify that the ratemaking process to set the amount of compensation for electricity produced by eligible customer-generators be initiated by a retail electric supplier or generation and transmission cooperative on behalf of one or more retail electric suppliers; prohibit eligible customer-generators who close their net metering accounts from receiving any cash refund for accumulated excess generation credits; require the net metering tariff provisions for eligible customer-generators in place when they started taking net metering service to remain in effect for 25-years for eligible generating facilities, including the one-to-one kilowatt-hour denominated credit provided for electricity fed into the grid; specify that eligible customer-generators shall be subject to all changes in energy rates, rate structures, and monthly charges as nonparticipating customers during that 25 year period; specify that eligible customer-generator installations are transferable to other persons at the same premises; amend KRS 278.467 to conform; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to net metering.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House: Recede HFA 1 RCS# 371 (Y: 50 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 372 (Y: 55 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 42 (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 34 (Y: 53 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 799 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 101)
2019-03-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-14HouseBill passed 55-36
2019-03-14HouseHouse receded from floor amendment (1)
2019-03-01Houseposted for passage for receding from House floor amendment (1)
2019-02-22Houseto Rules (H)
2019-02-22Housereceived in House
2019-02-21SenateSenate refused to concur in House floor amendment (1)
2019-02-21Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendment (1)
2019-02-15Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-15Housepassed 71-24 with floor amendment (1)
2019-02-15Housefloor amendment (4) defeated
2019-02-15House3rd reading
2019-02-14Housefloor amendments (1), (2), (3), (4), (5) and (6) filed
2019-02-14Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
2019-02-14Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-13Houseposted in committee
2019-02-13Houseposting waived
2019-02-13Houseto Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2019-02-13House1st reading
2019-02-13Housetaken from Committee on Committees (H)
2019-02-13Housereceived in House
2019-02-13Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-02-13Senate3rd reading, passed 23-12
2019-02-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 13, 2019
2019-02-13Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2019-02-12Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2019-02-12Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2019-02-12Senate2nd reading
2019-02-12Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2019-02-11Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2019-02-11Senate1st reading
2019-02-11Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2019-02-11Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb100.html
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb100/orig_bill.pdf
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb100/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB100/SFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB100/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB100/HFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB100/HFA3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB100/HFA4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB100/HFA5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB100/HFA6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb100/vote_history.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback