KY SB101 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 57)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 57)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.2951 to require the Council on Postsecondary Education to facilitate the implementation of a standardized articulation agreement for each approved high school career pathway to be honored at any public college or university.
Title
AN ACT relating to awarding of credit under articulation agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] | Sen. George Wise [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 317 (Y: 81 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1226 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1226 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 57) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 81-2 |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-13 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | received in House |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 11, 2020 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-23 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Higher
Education, Vocational
State Agencies
Universities and Colleges
Education, Higher
Education, Vocational
State Agencies
Universities and Colleges