KY SB109 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 376.135 to specify goods used in custom operations on farms for purposes of lien requirements.
Title
AN ACT relating to custom operations on farms.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Hornback [R] | Sen. Robert Mills [R] | Sen. Dennis Parrett [D] | Sen. Whitney Westerfield [R] |
Sen. George Wise [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | recommitted to Agriculture (S) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sb109.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sb109/orig_bill.pdf |