KY SB115 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 111)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 111)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 162.2847 to include graduate programs in the tuition waiver for foster and adopted children; extend the eligibility time period.
Title
AN ACT relating to the tuition waiver for Kentucky foster or adopted children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 364 (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1269 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1269 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 111) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 83-3 |
2020-04-14 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-04-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-17 | House | posting waived |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | received in House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | introduced in Senate |