KY SB116 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 157.195 to 157.290 to establish the State Advisory Council for Exceptional Children; amend KRS 156.029 to revise the Kentucky Board of Education; amend KRS 158.6453 to revise the standards and assessments process review committee; repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 158.6452 to revise the School Curriculum, Assessment, and Accountability Council; repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 158.648 to rename the State Advisory Council for Gifted and Talented Education the Gifted and Talented Education Advisory Council and revise the council; repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 158.794 to rename the Reading Diagnostic and Intervention Grant Steering Committee the Read to Achieve Council and revise the council; repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 161.017 to revise the authority of the Education Professional Standards Board and replace the executive director with the Commissioner of Education; repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 161.028 to revise the Education Professional Standards Board; amend KRS 161.220 to clarify retirement system participation for employees of the Education Professional Standards Board; amend KRS 164.011 to revise the Council on Postsecondary Education; repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 200.700 to revise the Early Childhood Advisory Council; amend KRS 12.020, 18A.115, 151B.134, 156.553, 158.792, 158.842, 161.100, and 161.126 to conform; repeal KRS 160.158 relating to the Council for Community Education; confirm, in part, Executive Orders 2018-581, 2018-597, and 2018-653.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
Sen. George Wise [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 2, sfa 3 RSN# 920 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | to Education (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | received in House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | passed 25-11 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (2) and (3) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-01 | Senate | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-01 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Boards and Commissions
Children and Minors
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Higher
Reorganization
State Agencies
Teachers
Boards and Commissions
Children and Minors
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Higher
Reorganization
State Agencies
Teachers