KY SB121 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - posted in committee
Pending: House Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - posted in committee
Pending: House Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.39-020 to define "health care provider"; amend the definition of "medical expense"; make technical corrections; amend KRS 304.39-130 to increase loss per week dollar cap to $400; amend KRS 304.39-241 to clarify when a reparation obligor must honor a written direction of benefits provided by an insured; amend KRS 304.39-245 to prohibit providers from charging or balance billing for an amount in excess of that which would be allowed under the definition of "medical expense" for services covered under basic reparation benefits; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2019.
Title
AN ACT relating to the motor vehicle reparations act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 4, SFA 3, SFA 5 RSN# 492 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 492 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 492 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-12 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | received in House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | passed 21-16 with floor amendments (3) (4) and (5) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn |
2018-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 5, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | floor amendment (5) filed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | floor amendment (4) filed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-02-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-02 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | introduced in Senate |