KY SB124 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 050)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 050)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 224.10-022 to remove the reference to KRS 12.210 relating to the hiring of the executive director of the Office of Kentucky Nature Preserves; amend KRS 224.71-100 to update references to the United States Department of Agriculture Natural Resources Conservation Service; amend KRS 224.71-110 to update references to the United States Department of Agriculture Natural Resources Conservation Service and Farm Service Agency; amend KRS 262.850 to extend the time period for a local soil and water conservation district to review a petition to create agricultural district from 60 days to 100 days; extend the period of time the Soil and Water Conservation Commission has to review the recommendation of the district board of supervisors from 60 days to 100 days; amend KRS 262.900 and 353.655 to conform; repeal KRS 262.096; confirm Executive Order 2018-601.
Title
AN ACT relating to conservation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 297 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 831 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 831 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 050) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2019-03-06 | House | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | House | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2019-02-22 | House | received in House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-08 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Agriculture
Budget and Financial Administration
Environment and Conservation
Local Government
Reorganization
Technical Corrections
Budget and Financial Administration
Environment and Conservation
Local Government
Reorganization
Technical Corrections