KY SB125 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 61)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 311.900 to modify definitions used for athletic trainer licensing; amend KRS 311.901 to require athletic trainer regulations that include procedures, discipline, a code of ethics, and standards of practice; add a third supervising physician member to the athletic trainer advisory council; amend KRS 311.903 to describe activities that are or are not within an athletic trainer's scope of practice; direct the medical board to establish a formulary of legend medications an athletic trainer may obtain, transport, provide, or administer; authorize athletic training services for employment injuries; require an athletic trainer and the athletic trainer's supervising physician to complete a board form that establishes the athletic trainer's authorized practice activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to athletic trainers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 266 (Y: 71 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa1 RSN# 1282 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27Senatesigned by Governor (Acts ch. 61)
2020-03-19Senatedelivered to Governor
2020-03-19Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-19Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-19House3rd reading, passed 71-11
2020-03-19Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
2020-03-19Housereported favorably, to Rules
2020-03-18Housereturned to Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-18House2nd reading
2020-03-18Housetaken from Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-17Houseposting waived
2020-03-17Housereturned to Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-17House1st reading
2020-03-17Housetaken from Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-09Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-06Housereceived in House
2020-03-05Senate3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2020-03-04Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 5, 2020
2020-03-03Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-28Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-27Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-30Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-28Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback