KY SB132 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - recommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 314.011 to allow designated advanced practice registered nurses certified in psychiatric-mental health nursing to prescribe up to two sequential refills for a 30 day supply of psychostimulants; amend KRS 314.042 to remove the one-year practice requirement before an APRN may prescribe controlled substances under a CAPA-CS; establish conditions for an APRN to prescribe controlled substances without a CAPA-CS after four years of controlled substance prescribing authority under a CAPA-CS; require an APRN whose license is in good standing to notify the nursing board when he or she will be prescribing without a CAPA-CS; prohibit any attempt to require or compel an APRN to maintain a CAPA-CS to prescribe after the four year threshold; exempt an equivalently qualified out-of-state APRN from the CAPA-CS requirement to prescribe under licensure by endorsement; require an APRN with less than four years of prescribing controlled substances to maintain a CAPA-CS until the four years are completed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the prescriptive authority of advanced practice registered nurses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01Senaterecommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2019-02-22Senatefloor amendment (3) filed
2019-02-20Senatefloor amendment (1-title) and (2) filed
2019-02-20Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-19Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-07Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2019-02-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback