KY SB132 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 18)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 18)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 29A.040 to add holders of personal identification cards issued within a county to the master list of potential jurors for that county.
Title
AN ACT relating to juries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 210 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1247 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1247 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 18) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 |
2020-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-27 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-02-25 | House | received in House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-19 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | introduced in Senate |