KY SB135 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 510.010 to define "sexual contact."
Title
AN ACT relating to defining sexual contact.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | recommitted to Judiciary (S) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |