KY SB139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - returned to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - returned to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS 304-17A to set requirements for reasonably adequate and accessible pharmacy benefit manager networks; permit the commissioner of the Department of Insurance to review and approve a compensation program that is fair and reasonable; except information and data collected by the department from KRS 61.870 to 61.884; prohibit pharmacy benefit managers from taking actions related to payment and practices; permit the commissioner to promulgate administrative regulations prohibiting practices by pharmacy benefit managers; amend KRS 304.17A-161 to apply definitions to Sections 1 and 4 of the Act; add definitions of independent pharmacy and specialty drug; amend KRS 304.17A-162 to add adjustment to appeals process for price updates; amend KRS 304.17A-164 to require health benefit plans and pharmacy benefit managers to implement certain pharmacy services practices and utilization review procedures; amend KRS 304.17A-005 to add pharmacy to the definition of health care provider; make technical corrections; amend KRS 304.17A-741 to add recoupment requirements for pharmacy audits; amend KRS 18A.225 to require the state employee health plan to comply with the requirements of the Act; amend KRS 205.522 to require Medicaid managed care organizations to comply with the requirements of the Act; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2020.
Title
AN ACT relating to coverage for pharmacy and pharmacist services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jimmy Higdon [R] | Sen. Julian Carroll [D] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Sen. Stephen Meredith [R] |
Sen. Johnny Turner [D] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Pharmacists
Public Medical Assistance
State Employees
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Pharmacists
Public Medical Assistance
State Employees
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb139.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb139/orig_bill.pdf |