KY SB141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - reassigned to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - reassigned to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 214.450 to define "hemochromatosis"; amend KRS 214.454 to establish that a person who is diagnosed with hemochromatosis shall be considered a qualified blood donor.
Title
AN ACT relating to blood donation.
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | reassigned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sb141.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sb141/orig_bill.pdf |