KY SB145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 034)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 034)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 286.9-010 to create distinct licenses for check cashing and for deferred deposit service business; make technical corrections; create a new section of Subtitle 9 of KRS Chapter 286 to allow the commissioner to require certain actions by licensees be filed with the State Regulatory Registry.
Title
AN ACT relating to check cashing and deferred deposit service businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 260 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 830 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 830 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 034) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2019-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2019-02-22 | House | received in House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |