KY SB15 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 031)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 031)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.380 to define "clear CA/N check"; amend the definition of "contractor"; remove exceptions that permitted superintendents and principals to hire relatives; amend the requirement for background checks and clear CA/N checks from contractors to narrow applicability to individuals with a written contract to provide services directly to a student or students as part of a school-sponsored program or activity on a regularly scheduled and continuing basis; permit probationary employment of an individual prior to receipt of a criminal history background check and clear CA/N check for positions vacant after July 31st; consolidate language, amend KRS 160.151, 160.345, 160.990, and 161.044 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to school policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 242 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 797 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 797 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 031) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2019-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 6, 2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-14 | House | to Education (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | received in House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-01-10 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |