KY SB153 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 088)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 246.120 to expand the membership of the Board of Agriculture to eighteen members; set board member terms; amend KRS 246.130 to conform; repeal and reenact KRS 251.010 to define terms as used in this chapter; create new sections of KRS Chapter 251 to establish the purpose of the provisions of the chapter; authorize the board, in conjunction with the department, to adopt and oversee policies, procedures, and programs pertaining to this chapter; require a licensee to issue scale tickets; set forth requirements related to issuing scale tickets; set forth licensing requirements for grain dealers and grain warehouse operators; authorize the board, in conjunction with the department, to promulgate administrative regulations setting forth a schedule of fees for licensed grain dealers and licensed grain warehouse operators; allow receipts collected from licensing fees to be used for expenses incurred by the Department of Agriculture; set forth requirements for surety bonds; set forth requirements to retain copies of business records; authorize the board, in conjunction with the department, to promulgate administrative regulations relating to record-keeping requirements for licensees; establish requirements to enter into forward pricing contracts; authorize the board, in conjunction with the department, to promulgate administrative regulations setting forth the information that shall be included in a forward pricing contract; require the department to conduct inspections of licensed grain warehouses and licensed grain dealers; define fund-covered grains; to set forth requirements for approval of fund-covered grains by the board; set forth requirements allowing a person to opt out of paying an assessment on fund-covered grains; establish criteria for a lien on grain; create a new section of KRS Chapter 251 to establish the powers and duties of the board in the event of a failure of a licensed grain dealer or licensed grain warehouse operator; create a new section of KRS Chapter 251 to allow an injured person to bring a civil action against the person or corporation who committed the violation; amend KRS 251.020 to establish the powers and duties of the board; authorize the board, in conjunction with the department, to promulgate administrative regulations necessary for the administration and enforcement of the chapter; allow the board to enter into cooperative agreements; take disciplinary action against any licensee or former licensee; amend KRS 251.440 to make technical corrections and to conform; set forth requirements for the department when approving a grain dealer license or a grain warehouse operator license; amend KRS 251.500 to make technical corrections; amend KRS 251.640 to clarify standards in which assessments shall be collected; amend KRS 251.650 to authorize the board to pay claims, management fees, investment fees, legal fees and administration fees; make technical corrections; amend KRS 251.660 to conform; amend 251.730 to conform; amend KRS 251.990 to establish penalties for offenses; amend KRS 64.012 to remove license fee for a grain warehouseman; repeal KRS 251.015; 251.410; 251.420; 251.430; 251.451; 251.480; 251.485; 251.490; 251.510; 251.520; 251.600; 251.610; 251.620; 251.630; 251.642; 251.670; 251.675; 251.680; 251.690; 251.700; 251.710; 251.720; 359.010; 359.020; 359.030; 359.040; 359.050; 359.060; 359.070; 359.090; 359.100; 359.110; 359.120; 359.130; 359.140; 359.150; 359.160; 359.170; 359.990; EFFECTIVE August 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to grain.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 947 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 253 (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 821 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 088)
2019-03-13Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-13Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-13Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-12SenateBill passed 37-0
2019-03-12SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2019-03-12Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-07House3rd reading, passed 92-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2019-03-06Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-03-06Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-06House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-05Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-27Houseposted in committee
2019-02-22Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-21Housereceived in House
2019-02-20Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0 with floor amendment (1)
2019-02-19Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-02-19Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2019-02-15Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2019-02-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
2019-02-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-11Senateto Agriculture (S)
2019-02-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb153.html
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb153/orig_bill.pdf
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb153/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB153/SFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb153/SFA1CI.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb153/SFA1LM.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb153/LM.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb153/CI.pdf
Roll Callhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb153/vote_history.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb153/FN.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb153/HCS1LM.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb153/HCS1CI.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback