KY SB154 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 532.130, 532.135, and 532.140 to add a diagnosis of serious mental illness to the disabilities which prevent execution for persons convicted of capital offenses.
Title
AN ACT relating to mental illness.
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Gerald Neal [D] | Sen. Tom Buford [R] | Sen. Morgan McGarvey [D] |
Sen. Robin Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | recommitted to Judiciary (S) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-09 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 9, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |