KY SB155 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 431.518, relating to pretrial drug assessment and treatment required by courts for certain felony offenders, to delete the felony language and make the provisions applicable to persons whose criminal records indicate recent substance abuse.
Title
AN ACT relating to substance abuse.
Sponsors
Sen. Ray Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | recommitted to Judiciary (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 5, 2013 |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2013-02-19 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB155.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB155/bill.doc |