KY SB157 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 061)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 061)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 511.100 to protect correctional institutions from trespass; amend KRS 520.010 to include drones in definition of dangerous contraband.
Title
AN ACT relating to drones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 300 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 886 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 886 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 061) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-03-01 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | received in House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Aeronautics and Aviation
Corrections and Correctional Facilities, State
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Local Mandate
Corrections and Correctional Facilities, State
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Local Mandate