KY SB159 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Health and Family Services (H)
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Health and Family Services (H)
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 211 to establish standards for the operation and maintenance of splash pads in a safe, sanitary manner.
Title
AN ACT relating to the operation of splash pads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1261 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | returned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | 2nd reading |
2020-03-18 | House | taken from Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | posting waived |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | House | taken from Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | received in House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | introduced in Senate |