KY SB160 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 93)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 93)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 367.372 to include additional definitions; amend KRS 367.374 to revise the time of an initial order to 15 days, provide for early termination, and clarify when prices are not in violation of the statute; amend KRS 367.374 to limit the total civil penalty allowed to $25,000 for any 24 hour period and limit additional penalties.
Title
AN ACT relating to the sale of consumer goods during a state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 363 (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 508 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 508 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 93) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | 3rd reading, passed 58-36 |
2018-03-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 19, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-03-13 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-09 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | received in House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 6, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB160.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SB160/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB160/vote_history.pdf |