KY SB160 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 045)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 045)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 176 to require the Department of Highways to report monthly to the General Assembly through the Legislative Research Commission on activity from the Highway Construction Contingency Account established under KRS 45.247; specify content of report; amend KRS 176.433 to make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to the highway construction contingency account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 948 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 262 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 842 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 262 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 842 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 045) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2019-03-13 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Bill passed 37-0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | received in House |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Budget and Financial Administration
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies
Transportation
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies
Transportation