KY SB17 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 15)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 158.183 to permit students to voluntarily express religious or political viewpoints in school assignments free from discrimination; require local boards of education to ensure that the selection of student speakers is made in a viewpoint-neutral manner, the student's prepared remarks are not altered before delivery without student's consent, religious and political organizations are allowed equal access to public forums on the same basis as nonreligious and nonpolitical organizations, and no recognized religious or political student organization is discriminated against in the ordering of its internal affairs; allow students to display religious messages on items of clothing, access public school facilities during noninstructional time as a religious student organization, use school media to announce student religious meetings, and meet as a religious student group during noninstructional time and before and after school to the same extent as students undertaking such actions in a nonreligious manner; permit public schools to sponsor artistic or theatrical programs that advance students' knowledge of society's cultural and religious heritage; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to allow a teacher to teach about religion with the use of the Bible or other scripture without providing religious instruction, and to teach about religious holidays in a secular manner; amend KRS 158.186 to require annual notification to local school boards, school-based decision making councils, and certified employees of statutes pertaining to religious freedom and expression in schools; create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to require public postsecondary education institution governing boards to ensure that students are permitted to voluntarily express religious or political viewpoints in assignments free from discrimination, the selection of student speakers is made in a viewpoint-neutral manner, the student's prepared remarks are not altered before delivery without the student's consent, religious and political organizations are allowed equal access to public forums on the same basis as nonreligious and nonpolitical organizations, no recognized religious or political student organization is discriminated against in the ordering of its internal affairs, and there are no restrictions on speech that occurs outdoors on campus and is protected by the First Amendment of the United States Constitution, except for restrictions that are reasonable, justified without reference to speech content, narrowly tailored to serve governmental interest, and limited to provide alternative options for the communication of the information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the expression of religious or political viewpoints in public schools and public postsecondary institutions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 15)
2017-03-06Senatedelivered to Governor
2017-03-06Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2017-03-06Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2017-03-06Senatereceived in Senate
2017-03-06House3rd reading, passed 81-8
2017-03-02Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
2017-03-01House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-28Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2017-02-27Houseposted in committee
2017-02-21Houseto Education (H)
2017-02-10Housereceived in House
2017-02-10Senate3rd reading, passed 31-3 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
2017-02-09Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2017-02-09Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 10, 2017
2017-02-09Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2017-01-07Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2017-01-04Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2017-01-04Senate2nd reading
2017-01-04Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2017-01-03Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2017-01-03Senate1st reading
2017-01-03Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2017-01-03Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback