KY SB175 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - signed by Governor (KY Acts Ch. 199)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 158.6453 to revise the standards and assessments process review committee; amend KRS 158.6455 to revise the requirements for the state accountability system; amend KRS 160.346 to revise the requirements for the targeted support and improvement designation; require the Department of Education to report to the Interim Joint Committee on Education on assessment results as they relate to the new graduation requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to public school assessments and accountability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL hcs1, hfa 3 RSN# 1127 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 391 (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 390 (Y: 77 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 844 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts Ch. 199)
2019-03-28Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-28Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-28Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-28SenateBill passed 36-1
2019-03-28SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (3)
2019-03-28Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (3)
2019-03-28Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-28House3rd reading, passed 89-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (3)
2019-03-28Housefloor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-03-12Housefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-03-07Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-03-06Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-06House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-05Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-01Houseposted in committee
2019-02-27Houseto Education (H)
2019-02-26Housereceived in House
2019-02-25Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-22Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-20Senatereturned to Education (S)
2019-02-20Senate1st reading
2019-02-20Senatetaken from Education (S)
2019-02-13Senateto Education (S)
2019-02-12Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback