KY SB177 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 26)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 26)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 317A.010 to change the change the definition from "blow dry services" to "shampoo and style services," and define "stylist"; amend KRS 317A.050 to provide for an instructor training eligibility certificate and to reduce the number of hours of instruction required for a shampoo and style license from 450 to 300, revise the terminology to conform, specify requirements for a temporary event services permit, and remove residency requirement; amend KRS 317A.090 to remove restriction on when instructional hours may be given; amend KRS 317A.155 to allow stylists to operate outside of an establishment licensed by the board under certain conditions and to require permission of the person, or his or her legal representative, receiving services.
Title
AN ACT relating to education and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/hfa3, hfta4, FINAL PASSAGE RSN# 1410 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 276 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 275 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 274 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1294 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 276 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 275 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 274 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1294 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 26) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | Senate | passed 30-0 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House floor amendments (3) and (4-title) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendments (3) and (4-title) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-0 with floor amendments (3) and (4-title) |
2020-03-19 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | floor amendments (3) and (4-title) filed |
2020-03-18 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2020-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-17 | House | posting waived |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | House | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-03-11 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-03-09 | House | received in House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 9, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | introduced in Senate |