KY SB183 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 620 to prohibit a parent, guardian, or other custodian from withdrawing, transfering, or in any way altering the current enrollment of a child to hinder an abused or neglected child investigation; make violation of the prohibition a Class A misdemeanor; make violation of the prohibition a Class D felony if the child is taken out of state; make notification of intent a defense to prosecution.
Title
AN ACT relating to child abuse or neglect investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1277 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-09 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | received in House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-0-1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 4, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | introduced in Senate |