KY SB186 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 43.020 to delete requirement that the Auditor of Public Accounts reside at the seat of government; amend KRS 43.030 to allow the assistant state auditor to recuse himself or herself in specified instances to comply with professional standards of accountancy; amend KRS 43.040 to require the Auditor of Public Accounts to file a certification of the inventory of the office with the Secretary of State at the end of his or her term of office and provide for delivery of the inventory to the successor of the Auditor of Public Accounts; provide that in the event of a vacancy in the office of Auditor of Public Accounts, the assistant state auditor shall deliver the inventory to the Auditor's successor; amend KRS 43.050 to provide the Auditor of Public accounts with the authority to bill for audits, examinations, investigations, and reviews; specify that the Auditor of Public Accounts may provide consulting services to state and local government entities and may charge a mutually agreed upon rate; delete reference to "outstanding warrants"; amend KRS 43.060 to specify that the Auditor of Public Accounts is required to annually audit the Commonwealth's Comprehensive Annual Financial Report (CAFR); amend KRS 43.090 to require that all audit reports and responses be posted online in a publicly searchable format; amend KRS 43.200 to make the Auditor of Public Accounts' scholarship discretionary rather than mandatory.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Auditor of Public Accounts.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Nemes [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 319 (Y: 70 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1263 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1263 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 59) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 70-14 |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-05 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | received in House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-21 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | introduced in Senate |