KY SB191 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 99)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 309.080 to add definitions of certified alcohol and drug counselor assistant I and II; create new sections of KRS 309.080 to 309.089 to establish requirements for certification of alcohol and drug couselor assistant I and II; amend KRS 309.083 to change required hours of experience for certified alcohol and drug counselors to 600 hours under supervision; permit registration as an alcohol and drug peer support specialist to substitute for required classroom hours; amend KRS 309.831 to reduce required hours of experience and education, and reduce required time in recovery from two to one year; amend KRS 309.805, 309.8013, and 309.088 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to substance use disorders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1446 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 356 (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 267 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1302 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1297 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-24Senatesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 99)
2020-04-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2020-04-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-04-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-04-14Senatebill passed 33-0
2020-04-14SenateFree Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
2020-04-14Senateposted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report
2020-04-14Senateto Rules (S)
2020-04-14Senatereceived in Senate
2020-04-14Housebill passed 86-4
2020-04-14HouseFree Conference Committee report adopted in House
2020-04-14Houseposted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report
2020-04-14HouseFree Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate
2020-04-14HouseFree Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
2020-04-14HouseConference Committee report adopted in House and Senate
2020-04-14HouseConference Committee report filed in House and Senate
2020-04-14HouseConference Committee appointed in Senate
2020-03-26HouseConference Committee appointed in House
2020-03-26HouseHouse refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-26Houseposted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-26Houseto Rules (H)
2020-03-26Housereceived in House
2020-03-26SenateConference Committee appointed in Senate
2020-03-26SenateSenate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-19Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-19Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-19House3rd reading, passed 81-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-19Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
2020-03-19Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-19Houseposting waived
2020-03-18Housereturned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2020-03-18House2nd reading
2020-03-18Housetaken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2020-03-17Houseposting waived
2020-03-17Housereturned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2020-03-17House1st reading
2020-03-17Housetaken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2020-03-12Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2020-03-10Housereceived in House
2020-03-10Senate3rd reading, passed 33-2 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-06Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2020
2020-03-05Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-04Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-24Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-02-20Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback