KY SB205 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - returned to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - returned to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 202A.021 to permit voluntary transport to a hospital or psychiatric facility with authorization of the admitting and receiving hospital or facility; amend KRS 645.030 to permit voluntary transport of a child to a hospital or psychiatric facility with authorization of the admitting and receiving hospital or facility and a parent if the child is under 16 and parent and child if the child is age 16 or older; amend KRS 645.190 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to mental health treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa1 RSN# 1390 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2020-03-19 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-19 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2020-03-19 | House | received in House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-17 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-17 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2020-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Guardians
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Mental Health
Parental Rights
Physicians and Practitioners
Guardians
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Mental Health
Parental Rights
Physicians and Practitioners